U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BATEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • May 05, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.