U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00015-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLONTZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.