U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Surrender]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.