U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PEARSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Amended Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.