U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DANIEL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.