U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:02-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 11, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.