U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:94-cr-00079-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Tinsley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Reducing Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.