U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order to Answer]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.