U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Butler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order to Answer]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.