U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:94-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.