U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRINSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.