U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00011-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOWEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 15, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.