U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ATWATER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2019
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 15, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.