U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00014-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MYERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 08, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 08, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.