U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00015-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BECK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.