U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.