U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MORGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 03, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.