U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEDRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.