U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCARTHREN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.