U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:94-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haynes, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.