U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00016-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEDRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.