U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:99-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WATSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.