U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00012-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COOLER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.