U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:99-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellerbee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.