U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00026-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROYAL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.