U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TOOMBS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.