U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GONZALEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.