U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DRAKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.