U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARRISH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.