U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.