U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • September 13, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.