U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REGISTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.