U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADEBOYEO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Order]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.