U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BORSETH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.