U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ANDERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.