U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DEMPSEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 18, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.