U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GONZALES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.