U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.