U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PATEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 15, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.