U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SHIVER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.