U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00037-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBERTS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.