U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.