U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-mj-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.