U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GWALTNEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.