U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BURNS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 08, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.