U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.