U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:95-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Parham et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.