U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00006-6
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FULLER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order]
  • March 06, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2019: [Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • October 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 04, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.