U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • December 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 08, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.