U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • July 20, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 04, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • June 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.